EP0949686 - Device for supporting a solar panel on a slanting roof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Econcern BV Kanaalweg 16/g 3526 KL Utrecht / NL | [2003/05] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states Coöperatief Advies en Onderzoeksburo u.a. Ecofys Kanaalweg 95 3533 HH Utrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaap, Antonius Bernardus Fahrenheitlaan 34 1222 LN Hilversum / NL | 02 /
Lepelaar, Mark Mariottestraat 12 2561 SM Den Haag / NL | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Kupecz, Arpad, et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Kupecz, A., Drs. c.s., et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2002/32] | Kupecz, A., Drs. c.s. Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [1999/41] | Duxbury, Stephen Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99201117.1 | 07.04.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | NL19981008846 | 08.04.1998 Original published format: NL 1008846 | [1999/41] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0949686 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949686 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/042, E04D13/18 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
H02S20/23 (EP);
F24S20/67 (EP);
F24S25/33 (EP);
Y02A30/60 (EP);
Y02B10/10 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stützvorrichtung für ein Solarpaneel auf Schrägdächern | [1999/41] | English: | Device for supporting a solar panel on a slanting roof | [1999/41] | French: | Dispositif pour supporter un panneau solaire sur des toits inclinés | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 10.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 14.04.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC | 22.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09] | Request for further processing for: | 21.08.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.09.2001 | Decision despatched | 22.09.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.09.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.05.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2001 | 30.04.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.03.2003 | BE | 05.03.2003 | CH | 05.03.2003 | FR | 05.03.2003 | LI | 05.03.2003 | DK | 05.06.2003 | PT | 05.06.2003 | SE | 05.06.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/23] | AT | 05.03.2003 | |
BE | 05.03.2003 | ||
CH | 05.03.2003 | ||
LI | 05.03.2003 | ||
DK | 05.06.2003 | ||
PT | 05.06.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 05.03.2003 | |
BE | 05.03.2003 | ||
CH | 05.03.2003 | ||
LI | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.06.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | AT | 05.03.2003 | |
CH | 05.03.2003 | ||
LI | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.06.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 05.03.2003 | |
CH | 05.03.2003 | ||
LI | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | CH | 05.03.2003 | |
LI | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 05.03.2003 | |
LI | 05.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH684202 (PLASTON AG KUNSTSTOFFWERK HANS) [A] 1,9,11-14* column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 45; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4408508 (SESOL GES FUER SOLARE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1,7,8 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 34; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19612490 (BRAAS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4,7-9 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0828035 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,9,10 * column 14, line 49 - column 15, line 27; figures 1,6 * |