blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0954953

EP0954953 - Ground milling machine provided with a cover mounted across the milling members [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.08.2004  [2004/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AVR bvba
Meensesteenweg 545
8800 Roeselare / BE
[2003/39]
Former [2003/16]For all designated states
Netagco AVR N.V.
Meensesteenweg 545
8800 Roeselare / BE
Former [1999/45]For all designated states
RUMPTSTAD INDUSTRIES B.V.
Lieve Vrouwepoldersedijk 1a
NL-3243 LA Stad aan 't Haringvliet / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Lerink, Peter
Laan van Moerkerken 85
3271 AJ Mijnsherenland / NL
[1999/45]
Representative(s)de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke, et al
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/36]de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke, et al
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
Former [2003/01]de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
Former [1999/45]Lips, Hendrik Jan George, Ir.
HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146
2596 HG Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date99201171.814.04.1999
[1999/45]
Priority number, dateNL1998100901628.04.1998         Original published format: NL 1009016
[1999/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0954953
Date:10.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0954953
Date:09.02.2000
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0954953
Date:03.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:A01B33/12
[1999/45]
CPC:
A01B33/12 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/42]
Former [1999/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Grundmühle mit über der Breite der Mühlelemente angeordnetem Schirm[1999/45]
English:Ground milling machine provided with a cover mounted across the milling members[1999/45]
French:Machine pour mouler la terre, avec écran monté au dessus la largeur des éléments moulants[2000/06]
Former [1999/45]Machine pour fraiser la terre, avec écran monté sur la largeur des éléments moulants
Examination procedure03.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
10.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
28.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2003Fee for grant paid
12.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]AU252068B  (HOWARD) [X] 1 * figure - * [A] 2,3;
 [A]US3768572  (BAUER I, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4254834  (VAN DER LELY ARY, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.