EP0952188 - Bituminous aggregate compounds, and process for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biardi, Giuseppe Via Casartelli, 7 I-21046 Malnate Varese / IT | For all designated states Luciani, Barbara Via Ortello 15 21100 Varese / IT | For all designated states Pellicioli, Paolo Via Ortello 15 21100 Varese / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states Biardi, Giuseppe Via Casartelli, 7 I-21046 Malnate, Varese / IT | ||
For all designated states Luciani, Barbara Via Ortello 15 21100 Varese / IT | |||
For all designated states Pellicioli, Paolo Via Ortello 15 21100 Varese / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/43] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1999/43] | Appoloni, Romano, et al ING. BARZANO' & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99201237.7 | 22.04.1999 | [1999/43] | Priority number, date | IT1998MI00856 | 22.04.1998 Original published format: IT MI980856 | [1999/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0952188 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0952188 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00, E01C7/26 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
E01C19/1068 (EP);
C08L95/00 (EP);
E01C7/265 (EP);
C08L2207/24 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L2666/08 (EP);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/74 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/43] | Extension states | AL | 28.12.1999 | LT | 28.12.1999 | LV | 28.12.1999 | MK | 28.12.1999 | RO | 28.12.1999 | SI | 28.12.1999 | Title | German: | Bituminöses Mischgut und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1999/43] | English: | Bituminous aggregate compounds, and process for its production | [1999/43] | French: | Enrobés bitumineux et leur méthode de préparation | [1999/43] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 14.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.07.2003 | CH | 30.07.2003 | CY | 30.07.2003 | FI | 30.07.2003 | LI | 30.07.2003 | NL | 30.07.2003 | DK | 30.10.2003 | GR | 30.10.2003 | SE | 30.10.2003 | PT | 30.12.2003 | IE | 22.04.2004 | LU | 22.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | [2007/21] |
Former [2005/24] | BE | 30.07.2003 | |
CH | 30.07.2003 | ||
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
LI | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
PT | 30.12.2003 | ||
IE | 22.04.2004 | ||
LU | 22.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | BE | 30.07.2003 | |
CH | 30.07.2003 | ||
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
LI | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
PT | 30.12.2003 | ||
LU | 22.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | BE | 30.07.2003 | |
CH | 30.07.2003 | ||
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
LI | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
PT | 30.12.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | BE | 30.07.2003 | |
CH | 30.07.2003 | ||
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
LI | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
PT | 30.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | BE | 30.07.2003 | |
CH | 30.07.2003 | ||
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
LI | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | BE | 30.07.2003 | |
CH | 30.07.2003 | ||
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
LI | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | CH | 30.07.2003 | |
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
LI | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | FI | 30.07.2003 | |
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 30.07.2003 | |
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 30.07.2003 | |
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 30.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1407229 (US RUBBER RECLAIMING CO INC) [X] 1-5 * page 2, lines 38-119 *; | [X]FR2512827 (BEUGNET SA [FR]) [X] 1-8 * page 1, lines 9-15 * * page 2, lines 5-14 * * page 3, lines 7-26 * * page 6, lines 18-25 *; | [X]FR2580658 (BEUGNET SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,8 * claims 1,3 * * page 3, lines 9-15 *; | [X]EP0439232 (HEIJMANS WEGENBOUWMIJ [NL]) [X] 1-5* claims 1,7,8 *; | [X]US5385401 (NATH ROBERT H [US]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-6 * |