blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0960811

EP0960811 - Bi-directional ballscrew noback device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  18.08.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/48]For all designated states
THE BOEING COMPANY
P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 13-08
Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Morgan, Bruce E.
22015 168th Court N.E.
Woodinville, Washington 98072 / US
02 / Zebroski, Henry A., Jr.
1718 47th Avenue S.W.
Seattle, Washington 98116 / US
[1999/48]
Representative(s)Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Former [1999/48]Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date99201261.721.04.1999
[1999/48]
Priority number, dateUS1998008739429.05.1998         Original published format: US 87394
[1999/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0960811
Date:01.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0960811
Date:15.03.2000
[2000/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0960811
Date:11.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:B64C13/28, B64C5/10, F16H25/20, F16D7/00, F16D59/00
[2000/11]
CPC:
B64C13/28 (EP,US); F16D55/00 (EP,US); F16D59/00 (EP,US);
F16D65/028 (EP,US); F16H25/2454 (EP,US); F16H2035/005 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1999/48]B64C5/10, B64C13/24, F16H25/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2000/47]
Former [1999/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bidirektionale, selbsthemmende Kugelgewindespindel[1999/48]
English:Bi-directional ballscrew noback device[1999/48]
French:Vis à billes bidirectionelle et autoblocante[1999/48]
Examination procedure11.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
16.09.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
26.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2003Fee for grant paid
15.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.11.2004  15.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Airbus SAS
1 Rond-Point Maurice Bellonte
31700 Blagnac / FR
Opponent's representative
Lepelletier-Beaufond, François
Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2005/01]
Opponent(s)01  10.11.2004   
Airbus SAS
1 Rond-Point Maurice Bellonte
31700 Blagnac / FR
Opponent's representative
Lepelletier-Beaufond, François
Santarelli, 14 avenue de la Grande Armée, BP 237
75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
20.12.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.06.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.03.2006Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2006/38]
15.03.2006Date of oral proceedings
03.05.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.05.2006Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.10.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.10.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
16.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.10.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US5582390  (RUSS DAVID E [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 2-4,6 * * column 1, line 12 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 57 - column 5, line 4 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 41 *;
 [A]US5655636  (LANG DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * column 3, line 47 - line 54 * * column 4, line 22 - line 59 * * column 5, line 39 - column 8, line 34 *;
 [A]US4762205  (ORTMAN MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 13 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 15 *;
 [A]US3583248  (LANGENBERG PETER) [A] 1 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.