EP0955710 - System for supporting an apparatus on an electrical switchboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTICINO S.P.A. Via Messina, 38 20154 Milano / IT | [2006/39] |
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states BTICINO S.p.A. Via Messina, 38 20154 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fabrizi, Fabrizio Via Cucchi, 5 24100 Bergamo / IT | 02 /
Passera, Costantino Via Malakoff, 20 20094 Corsico - Milano / IT | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via della Quattro Fontane 15 00184 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.p.A. Via delle Quattro Fontane, 15 00184 Roma / IT | ||
Former [1999/45] | Maggioni, Claudio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99201386.2 | 04.05.1999 | [1999/45] | Priority number, date | IT1998MI00998 | 07.05.1998 Original published format: IT MI980998 | [1999/45] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0955710 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0955710 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0955710 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/04 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
H02B1/04 (EP);
H02B1/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT [2000/31] |
Former [1999/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR HALTERUNG EINES GERÄTES AUF EIN ELEKTRISCHES SCHALTFELD | [2005/29] | English: | System for supporting an apparatus on an electrical switchboard | [1999/45] | French: | Système de montage d'un appareil sur un tableau de commutation | [1999/45] |
Former [1999/45] | EINRICHTUNG ZUR HALTERUNG EINES GERÄTES AUF EIN ELEKTISCHES SCHALTFELD | Examination procedure | 03.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 25.05.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, CY, DK, FI, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 20.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.06.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0293325 (PAUL & SIEDLER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE9000781U (SIEMENS) [X] 1,2,7-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5667059 (LEE CHIU-SHAN [TW]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 25 - line 37 ** figure 7 *; | [A]EP0798834 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * |