blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969199

EP0969199 - Intake system for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.10.2005  [2005/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cummins Engine Company, Ltd.
Yarm Road Darlington
County Durham DL1 4PW / GB
For all designated states
Iveco (UK) Ltd.
Iveco Ford House, Station Road Watford
Hertfordshire WD1 1SR / GB
For all designated states
CNH U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road
Basildon, Essex S14 3AD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
Cummins Engine Company, Ltd.
Yarm Road
Darlington, County Durham DL1 4PW / GB
For all designated states
Iveco (UK) Ltd.
Iveco Ford House, Station Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 1SR / GB
For all designated states
CNH U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road
Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Cummins Engine Company, Ltd.
Yarm Road
Darlington, County Durham DL1 4PW / GB
For all designated states
Iveco (UK) Ltd.
Iveco Ford House, Station Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 1SR / GB
For all designated states
NEW HOLLAND U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road
Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Zappador, Paolo
Via San Rocco, 5
10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT
02 / Sowerby, Paul
The Old Mill, The Lee, Great Missenden
Buckinghamshire HP16 9LZ / GB
03 / Purcell, John J.
18D Lock Road
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1QW / GB
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al
CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A
8210 Zedelgem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al
New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A
8210 Zedelgem / BE
Application number, filing date99201798.807.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateGB1998001408330.06.1998         Original published format: GB 9814083
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969199
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969199
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969199
Date:03.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.05.2000
ClassificationIPC:F02M31/13
[2000/01]
CPC:
F02M35/10268 (EP,US); F02F7/006 (EP,US); F02M31/13 (EP,US);
F02M35/10052 (EP,US); F02M35/112 (EP,US); Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/12]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Einlasssystem für Brennkraftmaschine[2000/01]
English:Intake system for an internal combustion engine[2000/01]
French:Système d'admission pour moteur à combustion interne[2000/01]
Examination procedure13.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
24.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2004Fee for grant paid
02.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0783076  (PHILLIPS & TEMRO IND INC [US]) [X] 1,2,15 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 15 * * column 3, line 53 - column 8, line 1; figures 1-4 * [A] 3-14,16,17;
 [XA]GB2306570  (CUMMINS ENGINE CO INC [US]) [X] 1,2,15 * column 8, line 14 - column 14, line 11; figures 1-4 * [A] 3,8,12,16;
 [XA]US4685437  (TANAKA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,15 * column 5, line 4 - column 8, line 10; figures 1-4 * [A] 3,12;
 [E]WO9953187  (PHILLIPS & TEMRO IND INC [US]) [E] 1,2,8,12-16 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-4 *
by applicantUS5595164
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.