EP0974885 - Electronic checklist system with checklist inhibiting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Revocation of patent | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 13-08 Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeffrey, Gary S. 4722-68th Drive N.E. Marysville, Washington 98270 / US | 02 /
Boorman, Daniel J. 12541 N.E. 160th Place Woodinville, Washington 98072-7960 / US | 03 /
Hartel, Martin C. 613 South 17th Street Renton, Washington 98055 / US | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/04] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Ir. P.N. Hoorweg c.s., Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99201980.2 | 21.06.1999 | [2000/04] | Priority number, date | US19980122309 | 24.07.1998 Original published format: US 122309 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0974885 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0974885 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G05D1/00 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
G05B23/0272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/40] |
Former [2000/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektronisches Kontrollistensystem mit Kontrollistenverhinderung | [2000/04] | English: | Electronic checklist system with checklist inhibiting | [2000/04] | French: | Système de liste de contrôle avec moyens d'inhibition de cette liste | [2000/04] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 27.07.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 07.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.2004
08.11.2004
ADMISSIBLE Airbus SAS 1 Rond-Point Maurice Bellonte 31700 Blagnac / FR Opponent's representative Bonnans, Arnaud Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.2004
Airbus SAS 1 Rond-Point Maurice Bellonte 31700 Blagnac / FR Opponent's representative Bonnans, Arnaud Santarelli, 14 avenue de la Grande Armée, BP 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | 11.11.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/30] | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.08.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4970683 (HARSHAW ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1* column W *; | [A]FR2694104 (SEXTANT AVIONIQUE [FR]) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5444837 (BOMANS MURIEL [FR], et al) [A] 1,12 * column W *; | [DA]US5454074 (HARTEL MARTIN C [US], et al) [DA] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5522026 (RECORDS ROGER M [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W * |