Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0972856
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
31.12.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] |
09.01.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] |
18.12.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.12.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.09.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.06.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.12.2002 |
First examination report |
|
19.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.10.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
11.08.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 27.09.2000 [2000/39] |
07.07.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] |
03.12.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] |
09.11.1999 |
Loss of particular rights |
|