EP0972856 - Electrolytic cell for recovering metal from solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gowan, Bruce Spalding c/o Kodak Limited, Headstone Drive Harrow, HA1 4TY / GB | 02 /
Rider, Christopher Barrie c/o Kodak Limited, Headstone Drive Harrow, HA1 4TY / GB | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Lee, Brenda, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Barker, Brenda, et al Kodak Limited, Patents, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 99202119.6 | 29.06.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | GB19980015172 | 14.07.1998 Original published format: GB 9815172 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0972856 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0972856 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C25C7/00, C25C1/20 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
C25C1/20 (EP,US);
C25C7/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/39] |
Former [2000/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrolytische Zelle für die Rückgewinnung von Metallen aus Lösungen | [2000/03] | English: | Electrolytic cell for recovering metal from solution | [2000/03] | French: | Cellule d'électrolyse pour la récupération de métaux de solutions | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0882816 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [PX] 1,2,7-9,11,12,18 * column 2, line 35 - line 41 * * column 5, line 39 - line 44 * * column 6, line 5 - line 33 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4675085 (VASQUEZ ADALBERTO [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 39 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4802961 (WOOG MANFRED J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 2 * * figures 6,7 *; | [DA]US4372829 (COX JOHNNY C) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 7 * * figures 1,2 * |