EP0949081 - High resolution multicolor ink jet printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPECTRA, INC. P.O. Box 68C Etna Road Hanover, NH 03755 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states SPECTRA, INC. P.O. Box 68-C Hanover, NH 03755 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoisington, Paul A. R.F.D. Box 145A Thetford Center, Vermont 05075 / US | 02 /
Spehrley, Charles W., Jr. Hathorn Hill White River Junction, Vermont 05001 / US | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Cole, Paul Gilbert Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Cole, Paul Lucas & Co., 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99202139.4 | 02.05.1996 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | US19950432783 | 02.05.1995 Original published format: US 432783 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0949081 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949081 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/205, B41J11/00, B41J2/175 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
B41J2/2056 (EP,US);
B41J13/223 (EP,US);
B41J19/16 (EP,US);
B41J2/01 (EP,US);
B41J2/17593 (EP,US);
B41J2/195 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/26] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hochauflösender Mehrfarbentintenstrahldrucker | [1999/41] | English: | High resolution multicolor ink jet printer | [1999/41] | French: | Imprimante à jet d'encre à plusieurs couleurs à haute résolution | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 17.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96913907.0 / EP0771274 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0610096 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,9 * figures 22,24,36 * * column 57, line 6 - line 38 * [Y] 5,6,8; | [XA]JPH0247075 ; | [Y]EP0568272 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 5 * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 5; figures 1,6 * * page 11, line 9 - line 21 *; | [Y]WO8912215 (SPECTRA INC [US]) [Y] 6 * page 14, line 8 - page 15, line 12 * * page 26, line 4 - line 20; figures 2,4 *; | [Y]US4538160 (UCHIYAMA TADAMITSU [JP]) [Y] 8 * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 68; figure 3 *; | [A]DE4021227 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 6 * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 5; figures 1,2 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900427), vol. 014, no. 209, Database accession no. (M - 0968), & JP02047075 A 19900216 (MINOLTA CAMERA CO LTD) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [A] 2,4,6,8 | by applicant | US4672432 | US4686538 | US4692773 | US4814786 | US4940995 | US4937598 | US5075689 |