EP0981062 - Nuclear magnetic resonance logging with azimuthal resolution using gradient coils [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS LIMITED P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ganesan, Krishnamurthy 918 Tyler Run Sugar Land, Texas 77479 / US | 02 /
Heidler, Ralf 5010 Grove West Boulevard, No. 1909 Stafford, Texas 77477 / US | 03 /
Speier, Peter 10502 Fountain Lake Drive, No. 1531 Stafford, Texas 77477 / US | 04 /
Crary, Steven 14 Howell Lane Sugar Land, Texas 77479 / US | 05 /
Luong, Bruno 10502 Fountain Lake Drive, No. 1737 Stafford, Texas 77477 / US | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Hyden, Martin Douglas Etudes et Productions Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department 1 rue Henri Becquerel B.P. 202 92142 Clamart Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hyden, Martin Douglas Etudes et Productions Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department 1 Rue Henri Becquerel B.P. 202 92142 Clamart Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/35] | Hyden, Martin Intellectual Property Law Department Schlumberger Riboud Product Centre 1, rue Becquerel, BP 202 92142 Clamart / FR | ||
Former [2000/08] | Hagel, Francis Etudes et Productions Schlumberger A L'ATTENTION DU SERVICE BREVETS 26, rue de la Cavée B.P. 202 92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99202224.4 | 07.07.1999 | [2000/08] | Priority number, date | US19980094680P | 30.07.1998 Original published format: US 94680 P | US19980186951 | 05.11.1998 Original published format: US 186951 | [2000/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0981062 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0981062 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/32 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
G01N24/081 (EP);
G01V3/32 (EP);
G01R33/385 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2003/37] |
Former [2000/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kernspinresonanz-Bohrlochmessung mit azimuthaler Auflösung unter Benutzung von Gradient-Sspulen | [2000/08] | English: | Nuclear magnetic resonance logging with azimuthal resolution using gradient coils | [2000/08] | French: | Diagraphie à résonance magnétique nucléaire avec résolution azimuthale utilisant des bobines à gradient | [2000/08] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 01.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/30] | 13.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.03.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   22.03.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US5557201 (KLEINBERG ROBERT L ET AL) [YD] 1,24,27,41,45,70 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 13; figure 1 *; | [YA]US4715383 (EHMAN RICHARD L ET AL) [Y] 1,24,27,41,45,70 * column 2, line 21 - line 37 * * column 6, line 6 - line 15 * * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 34 * [A] 3,4,7,11,12,29,30,47,48; | [A]US5270649 (LAUKIEN GUNTHER) [A] 1,27 * column 12, line 38 - column 13, line 2 *; | [A]US4769602 (VINEGAR HAROLD J ET AL) [A] 1,27 * column 3, line 60 - line 63 * * column 4, line 15 - line 38 * * figure 1 * | [A] - LEE S Y ET AL, "LOCALIZED VOLUME SELECTION TECHNIQUE USING AN ADDITIONAL RADIAL GRADIENT COIL", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (19891001), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 56 - 63, XP000081155 [A] 1,5,9,10,13,16,17,31,42,44,49 * page 58 - page 61; figure 1A * |