blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980017

EP0980017 - Light modulating layer with different transmissive states [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.09.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Stephenson, Stanley Wind, c/o Eastman Kodak Co.
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Lewandowsky, Klaus, et al
Kodak Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung
70323 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung
70323 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99202487.729.07.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateUS1998013175510.08.1998         Original published format: US 131755
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980017
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0980017
Date:20.12.2000
[2000/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.2000
ClassificationIPC:G02F1/1343, G02F1/1333, G02F1/137, G02F1/155, G02F1/167
[2000/07]
CPC:
G02F1/13439 (EP,US); G02F1/1334 (EP,US); G02F1/134336 (EP,US);
G02F1/13718 (EP,US); G02F1/155 (US); G02F1/1676 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/36]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lichtmodulierende Schicht mit unterschiedlich lichtdurchlässigen Zuständen[2000/07]
English:Light modulating layer with different transmissive states[2000/07]
French:Couche modulant la lumière aux états de transmission différents[2000/07]
Examination procedure15.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/28]
20.09.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/46]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS6053931  ;
 [A]US3424581  (NAWN GEORGE H, et al) [A] 2,3 * column 1, line 10 - column 3, line 42 ** column 9, line 46 - line 58 *;
 [A]US5124183  (NAKANO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6-9 * second embodiment *;; figures 7-9 *;
 [DA]EP0579268  (MANCHESTER R & D PARTNERSHIP [US]) [DA] 1,2,4,6-8 * column 7, line 41 - column 8, line 45 * * column 10, line 6 - line 50 * * column 12, line 17 - column 13, line 19 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 12; figures 1-4 *;
 [DA]US5695682  (DOANE J WILLIAM [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,4,6,8 * column 16, line 65 - column 19, line 45; figures 1-6 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850727), vol. 009, no. 182, Database accession no. (P - 376), & JP60053931 A 19850328 (CANON KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.