EP0979981 - Solar collector and method for manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kooij, Albertus Lorentzlaan 14 7535 CK Enschede / NL | [2000/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2000/07] | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99202522.1 | 30.07.1999 | [2000/07] | Priority number, date | NL19981009837 | 11.08.1998 Original published format: NL 1009837 | [2000/07] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979981 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/46, F24J2/26, F24J2/48, B29C65/02, B29D24/00 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
B29D99/001 (EP,US);
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C65/10 (EP,US);
B29C66/112 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/131 (EP,US);
B29C66/474 (EP,US);
B29C66/5326 (EP,US);
B29C66/5346 (EP,US);
B29C66/536 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/8161 (EP,US);
B29C66/8362 (EP,US);
B29D24/008 (EP,US);
F24S10/73 (EP,US);
F24S10/753 (EP,US);
F24S70/14 (EP,US);
F24S80/457 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29L2031/18 (EP,US);
B29L2031/601 (EP,US);
B29L2031/602 (EP,US);
F24S2010/71 (EP,US);
Y02B10/20 (EP,US);
Y02E10/44 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2021/003 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/04 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/10 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2025/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/07] | Title | German: | Sonnenkollektor und dessen Verfahren zur Herstellung | [2000/07] | English: | Solar collector and method for manufacture thereof | [2000/07] | French: | Collecteur solaire et procédé de fabrication | [2000/07] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 09.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/36] | 12.04.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR1266514 (SIMON DOMINIQUE EDMOND PIERRE) [Y] 1,8-10,12 * page 1, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 2, column L, paragraph 5 * * figures 1,4 * [A] 13; | [A]NL7905950 (RHONE POULENC IND) [A] 1,3,8,9,12 * page 5, line 6 - line 11 * * page 7, line 8 - line 9 * * page 8, line 16 - line 36 * * page 10, line 12 - page 15, line 9; figure - *; | [A]NL8100527 (WAVIN BV) [A] 7,11,14* page 3, line 26 - page 6, line 23; figure - *; | [YA]FR2507645 (DUBOIS HENRI [FR]) [Y] 1,8-10,12 * page 4, line 23 - page 6, line 29; figures 1-4 * [A] 3,6,11; | [A]US4608960 (HERING REINHARD [CH]) [A] 2 * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 15; figures 1,2 * |