EP0978399 - Panel assembly for an open roof construction for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inalfa Roof Systems Group B.V. Smakterweg 70 5804 AH Venray / NL | [2003/36] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states Inalfa Industries B.V. Maasheseweg 83 5804 AB Venray / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boersma, Egbert Oudartstraat 6 5708 CR Helmond / NL | 02 /
Schrans, Wilhelmus Maria Theresia Hendricus Voermansweide 7 3437 DG Nieuwegein / NL | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Metman, Karel Johannes De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Metman, Karel Johannes De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2000/06] | Metman, Karel Johannes De Vries & Metman, Gebouw Autumn, Overschiestraat 184 N 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 99202528.8 | 02.08.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | NL19981009807 | 05.08.1998 Original published format: NL 1009807 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978399 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978399 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/04, B60J10/12 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
B60J7/04 (EP,US);
B60J10/82 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/43] |
Former [2000/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Plattenanordnung für eine öffnungsfähige Dachkonstruktion eines Fahrzeuges | [2002/48] | English: | Panel assembly for an open roof construction for a vehicle | [2000/06] | French: | Assemblage d'un panneau pour la construction d'un toit ouvrant de véhicule | [2002/48] |
Former [2000/06] | Panelanordnung für die Konstruktion eines öffnungsfähigen Fahrzeugdach | ||
Former [2000/06] | Assemblage d'un panneau pour la construction d'un toit ouvrant de vehicule | Examination procedure | 20.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 22.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0771684 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [DA] 1 * page 3, line 2 - page 5, column 3, line 1 *; | [A]DE19501389 (HENNIGES ELASTOMER KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 34; figure 1 *; | [A]US5344603 (JARDIN HANS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 31; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | WO9708355 | EP0771684 |