EP0981003 - Pipe coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. van Walraven B.V. Industrieweg 5 3641 RK Mijdrecht / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states J. van Walraven B.V. Industrieweg 5 NL-3641 RK Mijdrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Walraven, Jan 6, Prins Bernhardlaan 3641 GP Mijdrecht / NL | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 99202616.1 | 10.08.1999 | [2000/08] | Priority number, date | NL19981009881 | 17.08.1998 Original published format: NL 1009881 | [2000/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981003 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/08, F16L47/06 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
F16L47/12 (EP);
F16L21/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/45] |
Former [2000/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rohrkupplung | [2000/08] | English: | Pipe coupling | [2000/08] | French: | Raccord de tuyaux | [2000/08] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/29] | 12.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.10.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.10.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE19542463 (MERO GMBH & CO.) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]DE4103702 (MERO-WERKE GMBH & CO.) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]DE3632127 (RASMUSSEN GMBH) [AD] 1 * abstract * |