EP0985915 - Automatic recognition of different types of liquid level sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon, Essex S14 3AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states CNH U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB | ||
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berger, John G. 86 Farmington Place Landisville, PA 17538 / US | 02 /
Chow, Mark K. 1903 Glenwold Drive Paoli, PA 19301 / US | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 99202875.3 | 03.09.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | US19980151093 | 10.09.1998 Original published format: US 151093 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0985915 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0985915 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | [2003/23] |
Former [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP0985915 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[2003/10] | |||
[2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/00 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
G01F23/806 (EP,US);
G01F23/802 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Title | German: | Automatisches Erkennen von unterschiedlichen Flüssigkeitsstandssensoren | [2000/11] | English: | Automatic recognition of different types of liquid level sensor | [2000/11] | French: | Reconnaissance automatique de différentes sortes de capteur de niveau de liquide | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 23.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US939675 (DALY JAMES REGEAN [US]) [A] 1-5 * whole document *; | [A]US4353245 (NICOLAI WALTER) [A] 1-5 * whole document *; | [A]US4819483 (EMPLIT RAYMOND H [US], et al) [A] 1-5* whole document *; | [AD]US5532673 (OLSON DANIEL E [US], et al) [AD] 1-5 * whole document *; | [A]US5613399 (HANNAN ALAN R [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * whole document *; | [XA]US5751611 (JAMIESON BRIAN THOMAS [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 1 - column 12; figure 5 * [A] 2,5 |