EP0993117 - Energy recovery arrangement for a power electronic switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electric Boat Corporation 75 Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340-4989 / US | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maurio, Joseph M. 302 Boston Post Road Waterford, CT 06385 / US | 02 /
Thaxton, Edgar S 3 Wayland Street Bradford, RI 02808 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99203077.5 | 20.09.1999 | [2000/15] | Priority number, date | US19980167353 | 07.10.1998 Original published format: US 167353 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0993117 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0993117 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/00, H01L35/02, H02M3/00, H01L35/00 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
H03K17/6871 (EP,US);
H10N10/17 (EP,US);
H03K2217/0036 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/15] | H03K17/00, H01L35/02, H02M3/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/43] |
Former [2000/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Energierückgewinnungsschaltung für einen Elektronischen Leistungsschalter | [2000/15] | English: | Energy recovery arrangement for a power electronic switch | [2000/15] | French: | Disposition de récupération d'énergie pour un interrupteur éléctronique de puissance | [2000/15] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/21] | 18.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.09.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.09.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0992761 ; | [A]US5419780 (SUSKI EDWARD D [US]); | [PXA]EP0887868 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) |