EP0969164 - A method for laying and mechanically joining floor panels and a method for producing a floor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Välinge Innovation AB Apelvägen 2 260 40 Viken / SE | [2004/33] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Välinge Aluminium AB Kyrkogränd 1 260 40 Viken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pervan, Tony Skeppargatan 41 11452 Stockholm / SE | [2000/18] |
Former [2000/01] | 01 /
Pervan, Tony Radjursstigen 32 170 72 Solna / SE | Representative(s) | Åkesson, Sten Jan-Åke, et al Awapatent AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | Åkesson, Sten Jan-Åke, et al Awapatent AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Bokinge, Ole, et al Awapatent AB Platensgatan 9 C 582 20 Linköping / SE | ||
Former [2000/01] | Giver, Sören Bo Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 99203328.2 | 29.04.1994 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | SE19930001595 | 10.05.1993 Original published format: SE 9301595 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0969164 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0969164 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0969164 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/14, E04F15/02, E04F13/08, E04F15/04 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
E04F15/02 (EP,US);
E04F15/04 (EP,FI,US);
E04F15/14 (KR);
E04F13/0801 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0115 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0153 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/01] | E04F15/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | Methode zum Verlegen und mechanischen Verbinden von Fussbodenplatten und eine Methode zur Herstellung eines Fussbodens | [2000/01] | English: | A method for laying and mechanically joining floor panels and a method for producing a floor | [2000/01] | French: | Méthode pour la pose et la jonction de panneaux de plancher et méthode pour la production d'un plancher | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94915725.9 / EP0698162 | EP98201555.4 / EP0877130 | EP99202903.3 / EP0969163 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.03.2004
19.04.2007
WITHDRAWN UNILIN FLOORING N.V. Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE Opponent's representative Hammond, Andrew David, et al, et al Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Gothenburg / SE | 02
20.04.2004
29.05.2008
WITHDRAWN Akzenta Paneele + Profile GmbH Classen Holzkontor GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Str.18-20 Werner-von Siemens-Str. 18-20 56759 Kaisersesch 56759 Kaisersesch / DE Opponent's representative Jungen, Rolf, et al, et al Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 03
09.09.2004
14.10.2005
WITHDRAWN KRONOTEX Fussboden GmbH Wittstocker Chaussee 1 16909 Heiligengrabe / DE Opponent's representative Rehmann, Thorsten, et al, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | 04
09.09.2004
30.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE E.F.P. Floor Products Fussböden GmbH Weiberndorf 20 6380 St. Johann i. T. / AT Opponent's representative Rox, Thomas, et al, et al Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | 05
10.09.2004
30.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE Spanolux SA Zoning Industriel de Burtonville 6690 Vielsalm / BE Opponent's representative Metman, Karel Johannes, et al, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.03.2004
19.04.2007
WITHDRAWN UNILIN FLOORING N.V. Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE Opponent's representative Hammond, Andrew David, et al, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | ||
02
20.04.2004
29.05.2008
WITHDRAWN Akzenta Paneele + Profile GmbH Classen Holzkontor GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Str.18-20 Werner-von Siemens-Str. 18-20 56759 Kaisersesch 56759 Kaisersesch / DE Opponent's representative Jungen, Rolf, et al, et al Lippert, Stachow & Partner Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | |||
03
09.09.2004
14.10.2005
WITHDRAWN KRONOTEX Fussboden GmbH Wittstocker Chaussee 1 16909 Heiligengrabe / DE Opponent's representative Rehmann, Thorsten, et al, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | |||
04
09.09.2004
30.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE E.F.P. Floor Products Fussböden GmbH Weiberndorf 20 6380 St. Johann i. T. / AT Opponent's representative Rox, Thomas Dr., et al, et al COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
05
10.09.2004
30.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE Spanolux SA Zoning Industriel de Burtonville 6690 Vielsalm / BE Opponent's representative Metman, Karel Johannes, et al, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | |||
Former [2008/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.03.2004
19.04.2007
WITHDRAWN UNILIN FLOORING N.V. Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE Opponent's representative Hammond, Andrew David, et al, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | ||
02
20.04.2004
29.05.2008
WITHDRAWN Akzenta Paneele + Profile GmbH Classen Holzkontor GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Str.18-20 Werner-von Siemens-Str. 18-20 56759 Kaisersesch 56759 Kaisersesch / DE Opponent's representative Jungen, Rolf, et al, et al Lippert, Stachow & Partner Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | |||
03
09.09.2004
14.10.2005
WITHDRAWN KRONOTEX Fussboden GmbH Wittstocker Chaussee 1 16909 Heiligengrabe / DE Opponent's representative Rehmann, Thorsten, et al, et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | |||
04
09.09.2004
30.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE E.F.P. Floor Products Fussböden GmbH Weiberndorf 20 6380 St. Johann i. T. / AT Opponent's representative Rox, Thomas Dr., et al, et al COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
05
10.09.2004
30.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE Spanolux SA Zoning Industriel de Burtonville 6690 Vielsalm / BE Opponent's representative Metman, Karel Johannes, et al, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | |||
Former [2007/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.03.2004
19.04.2007
WITHDRAWN UNILIN FLOORING N.V. Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE Opponent's representative Hammond, Andrew David, et al, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | ||
02
20.04.2004
29.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Akzenta Paneele + Profile GmbH Classen Holzkontor GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Str.18-20 Werner-von Siemens-Str. 18-20 56759 Kaisersesch 56759 Kaisersesch / DE Opponent's representative Jungen, Rolf, et al, et al Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner, Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | |||
03
09.09.2004
14.10.2005
WITHDRAWN KRONOTEX Fussboden GmbH Wittstocker Chaussee 1 16909 Heiligengrabe / DE Opponent's representative Rehmann, Thorsten, et al, et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | |||
04
09.09.2004
30.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE E.F.P. Floor Products Fussböden GmbH Weiberndorf 20 6380 St. Johann i. T. / AT Opponent's representative Rox, Thomas Dr., et al, et al COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
05
10.09.2004
30.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE Spanolux SA Zoning Industriel de Burtonville 6690 Vielsalm / BE Opponent's representative Metman, Karel Johannes, et al, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | |||
Former [2005/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.03.2004
20.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE UNILIN FLOORING N.V. Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE Opponent's representative Hammond, Andrew, et al, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB, Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | ||
02
20.04.2004
29.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Akzenta Paneele + Profile GmbH Classen Holzkontor GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Str.18-20 Werner-von Siemens-Str. 18-20 56759 Kaisersesch 56759 Kaisersesch / DE Opponent's representative Jungen, Rolf, et al, et al Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner, Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | |||
03
09.09.2004
14.10.2005
WITHDRAWN KRONOTEX Fussboden GmbH Wittstocker Chaussee 1 16909 Heiligengrabe / DE Opponent's representative Rehmann, Thorsten, et al, et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | |||
04
09.09.2004
30.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE E.F.P. Floor Products Fussböden GmbH Weiberndorf 20 6380 St. Johann i. T. / AT Opponent's representative Rox, Thomas Dr., et al, et al COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
05
10.09.2004
30.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE Spanolux SA Zoning Industriel de Burtonville 6690 Vielsalm / BE Opponent's representative Metman, Karel Johannes, et al, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | |||
Former [2004/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.03.2004
20.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE UNILIN FLOORING N.V. Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE Opponent's representative Hammond, Andrew, et al, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB, Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | ||
02
20.04.2004
29.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Akzenta Paneele + Profile GmbH Classen Holzkontor GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Str.18-20 Werner-von Siemens-Str. 18-20 56759 Kaisersesch 56759 Kaisersesch / DE Opponent's representative Jungen, Rolf, et al, et al Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner, Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | |||
03
09.09.2004
01.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE KRONOTEX Fussboden GmbH Wittstocker Chaussee 1 16909 Heiligengrabe / DE Opponent's representative Rehmann, Thorsten, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | |||
04
09.09.2004
30.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE E.F.P. Floor Products Fussböden GmbH Weiberndorf 20 6380 St. Johann i. T. / AT Opponent's representative Rox, Thomas Dr., et al, et al COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
05
10.09.2004
30.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE Spanolux SA Zoning Industriel de Burtonville 6690 Vielsalm / BE Opponent's representative Metman, Karel Johannes, et al, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | |||
Former [2004/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.03.2004
20.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE UNILIN FLOORING N.V. Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE Opponent's representative Hammond, Andrew, et al, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB, Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | ||
02
20.04.2004
29.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Akzenta Paneele + Profile GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 18 - 20 56759 Kaisersesch / DE Opponent's representative Jungen, Rolf, et al, et al Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner, Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | |||
Former [2004/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.03.2004
20.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE UNILIN FLOORING N.V. Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE Opponent's representative Hammond, Andrew, et al, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB, Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | 15.10.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.02.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.11.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.06.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/39] | 22.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 10.04.2008 | Appeal received No. T0543/08 | 10.06.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.06.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 12.03.2008 | Appeal received No. T0543/08 | 09.06.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.06.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 09.04.2008 | Appeal received No. T0543/08 | 22.06.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 22.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.06.2010 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/not-exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | BERRY WOOD SA R.N. 144 03360 Meaulne / FR | Date: | 23.01.2002 | ID: | 02 00/not-exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | BERRY FINANCE FRANCE Z.I. N 2 - Allée du Clos Jacquet 36000 Chateauroux / FR | Date: | 23.01.2002 | ID: | 03 00/not-exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | BERRY FINANCE FRANCE Z.I. N 2 - Allée du Clos Jacquet 36000 Chateauroux / FR | Date: | 23.01.2002 | ID: | 04 00/not-exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | BERRY FINANCE Ingelmunster Stegnweg 162 0780 Oostrozebeke / BE | Date: | 23.01.2002 | ID: | 05 00/not-exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | ALLOC AS Fiboveien 26 4580 Lyngdal / NO | Date: | 23.01.2002 | [2002/12] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 10.12.2003 | LI | 10.12.2003 | [2011/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]WO9313280 (JUNCKERS AS [DK]); | [AP]FR2691491 (GERAUD PIERRE [FR]) | Examination | DE1212275 | US4426820 | WO8402155 | WO9426999 |