EP1094042 - Fiber impregnation with thermoplastic and thermoset polymers as liquids, as emulsion or suspension [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Art Trading Services SA P.O. Box 985 BO, Wickham's Cay Road Town, Tortola Virgin Islands / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states Art Trading Services SA P.O. Box 985 BO, Wickham's Cay Road Town, Tortola, Virgin Islands / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99203473.6 | 22.10.1999 | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094042 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/18, B29C70/52, B29B15/12 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
C03C25/18 (EP);
B29B15/122 (EP);
B29C70/52 (EP);
B29C70/522 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/17] | Title | German: | Faserimprägnierung mit thermoplastischen oder thermohärtenden Polymeren als Flüssigkeiten, als Emulsion oder Suspension | [2001/17] | English: | Fiber impregnation with thermoplastic and thermoset polymers as liquids, as emulsion or suspension | [2001/17] | French: | Imprégnation de fibres avec des polymères thermoplastiques ou thermodurcissables comme des liquides, comme émulsion ou suspension | [2001/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 26.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/41] | 09.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0372266 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US5451355 (BOISSONNAT PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [X] 1-12* column 1, line 6 - column 6, line 56; figure - * |