Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9611066 | Global Dossier | 18.04.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | US32092194 | 11.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007215042 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80438907 | 18.05.2007 | US41962106 | 22.05.2006 | US86293497 | 29.05.1997 | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | US75280904 | 07.01.2004 | US42578699 | 22.10.1999 | US16783005 | 27.06.2005 | US32092194 | 11.10.1994 | US4120102 | 08.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7247205 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2007 | B2 | US2006196416 | 07.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US41962106 | 22.05.2006 | US86293497 | 29.05.1997 | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | US75280904 | 07.01.2004 | US42578699 | 22.10.1999 | US16783005 | 27.06.2005 | US32092194 | 11.10.1994 | US4120102 | 08.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7166164 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2007 | B2 | US2005235912 | 27.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86293497 | 29.05.1997 | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | US75280904 | 07.01.2004 | US42578699 | 22.10.1999 | US16783005 | 27.06.2005 | US32092194 | 11.10.1994 | US4120102 | 08.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6929698 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2005 | B2 | US2004137144 | 15.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | US75280904 | 07.01.2004 | US4120102 | 08.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3429316B | Global Dossier | 22.07.2003 | B2 | JPH10506842 | 07.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9510963 | 29.08.1995 | US32092194 | 11.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3429314B | Global Dossier | 22.07.2003 | B2 | JPH08510683 | 12.11.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US9405068 | 09.05.1994 | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3708445B | Global Dossier | 19.10.2005 | B2 | JP2001293422 | 23.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US32092194 | 11.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1878509 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP99203740 | 09.05.1994 | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | EP00203732 | 09.05.1994 | EP94919114 | 09.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1070547 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2008 | B1 | EP1070547 | 16.01.2002 | A3 | EP1070547 | 24.01.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP99203740 | 09.05.1994 | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | EP94919114 | 09.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1070546 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2007 | B1 | EP1070546 | 16.01.2002 | A3 | EP1070546 | 24.01.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP99203740 | 09.05.1994 | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | EP94919114 | 09.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0701486 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2000 | B1 | EP0701486 | 11.12.1996 | A4 | EP0701486 | 20.03.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9405068 | 09.05.1994 | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU680006B | Global Dossier | 17.07.1997 | B2 | AU7016894 | 20.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US9405068 | 09.05.1994 | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3374595 | Global Dossier | 02.05.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US9510963 | 29.08.1995 | US32092194 | 11.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0974400 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2002 | B1 | EP0974400 | 26.04.2000 | A3 | EP0974400 | 26.01.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | EP94919114 | 09.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9406723 | 06.02.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US9405068 | 09.05.1994 | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2161895 | 13.09.2005 | C | CA2161895 | 08.12.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9405068 | 09.05.1994 | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2200343 | 13.04.2004 | C | CA2200343 | 18.04.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9510963 | 29.08.1995 | US32092194 | 11.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2459147 | 18.04.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2200343 | 29.08.1995 | US32092194 | 11.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19581792T | 18.09.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9510963 | 29.08.1995 | US32092194 | 11.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69425435T | 22.03.2001 | T2 | DE69425435D1 | 07.09.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9405068 | 09.05.1994 | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR960702353 | 27.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US9405068 | 09.05.1994 | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE520183 | 10.06.2003 | C2 | SE9701187L | 28.05.1997 | L | SE9701187D0 | 01.04.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US9510963 | 29.08.1995 | US32092194 | 11.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6679193 | 20.01.2004 | B2 | US2002096111 | 25.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | US86293497 | 29.05.1997 | US42578699 | 22.10.1999 | US32092194 | 11.10.1994 | US4120102 | 08.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5743958 | 28.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | US32092194 | 11.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6071558 | 06.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | US86293497 | 29.05.1997 | US32092194 | 11.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6361605 | 26.03.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | US86293497 | 29.05.1997 | US42578699 | 22.10.1999 | US32092194 | 11.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9427736 | Global Dossier | 08.12.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE00203731T | 13.07.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE00203732T | 13.07.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69431169T | 12.12.2002 | T2 | DE69431169D1 | 12.09.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69435040T | 07.08.2008 | T2 | DE69435040D1 | 13.12.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69435065T | 02.01.2009 | T2 | DE69435065D1 | 21.02.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US6687393 | 25.05.1993 | Type | Divisional application | EP1070546 | EP1070547 | EP1878509 | Type | Earlier application | EP0701486 |