EP0990980 - Multiple microcontroller hard disk drive control architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seagate Technology LLC 920 Disc Drive Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US | [2000/43] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states Seagate Technology, Inc. 920 Disc Drive, P.O. Box 66360 Scotts Valley, California 95067-0360 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Squires, John P. 8330 Larkspur Boulder, CO 80302 / US | 02 /
Sander, Charles M. 8427 Greenwood Drive Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 03 /
Keeler, Stanton M. 1156 Columbia Drive Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 04 /
Clay, Donald W. 469 East Rainfree Court Loisville, CO 80027 / US | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Kenyon, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Kenyon, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 99203758.0 | 29.10.1991 | [2000/14] | Priority number, date | US19900611141 | 09.11.1990 Original published format: US 611141 | [2000/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0990980 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0990980 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0990980 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
G06F3/0601 (EP,US);
G06F3/0613 (EP,US);
G06F3/0619 (EP,US);
G06F3/0658 (EP,US);
G06F3/0676 (EP,US);
G06F9/46 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/14] | Title | German: | Festplattenantriebsteuerungsarchitektur mit mehreren Mikrokontrollern | [2000/14] | English: | Multiple microcontroller hard disk drive control architecture | [2000/14] | French: | Architecture de commande d'unité de disque dur à microcontroleurs multiples | [2000/14] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 12.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.09.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92901005.6 / EP0556324 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.03.2003 | IT | 12.03.2003 | NL | 12.03.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 12.03.2003 | |
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | NL | 12.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4965801 (DULAC KEITH B [US]) [A] 1,2,4-6 * column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 8; figures 1A,1B *; | [A]US4783705 (MOON RONALD R [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * column 9, line 47 - column 11, line 37; figure 6 *; | [A]EP0374114 (IBM [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * |