EP1000644 - Beam fastening assembly and kit for a swing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungle Gym B.V. Laboratoriumstraat 9-1 1059 BX Amsterdam / NL | [2004/48] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states The Original Jungle Gym 9, Laboratoriumstraat 1059 BX Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmit, Paulus Franciscus Maria 164-HS, Koninginneweg 1075 EG Amsterdam / NL | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 99203764.8 | 10.11.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | NL19981010545 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: NL 1010545 | [2000/20] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000644 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000644 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A63G9/00, E04B1/26 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
E04B1/2608 (EP);
A63G9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Balkens und Bausatz für eine Schaukel | [2000/20] | English: | Beam fastening assembly and kit for a swing | [2000/20] | French: | Dispositif de fixation pour une poutre et kit pour une balançoire | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 07.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 02.02.2005 | FI | 02.02.2005 | IT | 02.02.2005 | LI | 02.02.2005 | DK | 02.05.2005 | GR | 02.05.2005 | SE | 02.05.2005 | ES | 13.05.2005 | PT | 02.07.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/14] | CH | 02.02.2005 | |
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
ES | 13.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | CH | 02.02.2005 | |
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
ES | 13.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 02.02.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE511306 (CHRISTIAENSEN) [A] 1,6,11-13 * page 2, line 27 - line 30; figure 2 *; | [A]US5016873 (BOSSA DAVID W [US]); | [AD]US5364312 (CUNARD JOEL C [US], et al) [AD] 1,6,11-13 * column A; figure - *; | [AD]US5524397 (BYERS GARY L [US], et al) |