EP1022779 - Method and device for separating products, mounted on a common substrate, from each other, along (a) cutting line(s) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Besi Singulation B.V. Marconilaan 4 5151 Dr Drunen / NL | [2004/41] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states Meco Equipment Engineers B.V. Marconilaan 2 5151 DR Drunen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rischke, Jörg Werner Biezenkuilen 102 5502 PG Veldhoven / NL | 02 /
Menschaar, Hugo Franklin Moormanlaan 1 5511 PL Knegsel / NL | 03 /
van Sprang, Wilhelmus Gijsbertus Leonardus Mainelaan 109 5627 VJ Eindhoven / NL | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus, et al Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus, et al Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | ||
Former [2000/30] | Vollebregt, Cornelis Jacobus, Ir., et al Algemeen Octrooibureau World Trade Center P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 99203838.0 | 16.11.1999 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | NL19991011077 | 19.01.1999 Original published format: NL 1011077 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1022779 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/78, H01L21/48 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
H01L21/78 (EP,KR,US);
H05K3/0052 (EP,US);
Y10T83/0414 (EP,US);
Y10T83/0443 (EP,US);
Y10T83/0495 (EP,US);
Y10T83/263 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, NL [2001/15] |
Former [2000/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Methode zur Trennung von auf einem gemeinsamen Substrat montierten Produkten entlang einer Schneidelinie voneinander | [2000/30] | English: | Method and device for separating products, mounted on a common substrate, from each other, along (a) cutting line(s) | [2000/30] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de separation des produits l'un de l'autre, montés sur un supstrat commun selon des lignes prédéterminées | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 27.01.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE | 16.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.02.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06326185 ; | [A]JPH03198363 ; | [A]JPS55118647 ; | [A]DE3137301 (PRESCO INC [US]) [A] * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 095, no. 002, & JP06326185 A 19941125 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,3,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911125), vol. 015, no. 464, Database accession no. (E - 1137), & JP03198363 A 19910829 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1,3,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801122), vol. 004, no. 170, Database accession no. (E - 035), & JP55118647 A 19800911 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,3,6 * abstract * |