blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1018712

EP1018712 - Method and apparatus for transaction card security utilizing embedded image data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.06.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ray, Lawrence Allen
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Honsinger, Chris W.
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al
Kodak Limited
Patent Department (W160-G)
Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al
Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2000/28]Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al
Kodak Limited, Patents, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Application number, filing date99203953.724.11.1999
[2000/28]
Priority number, dateUS1998021861422.12.1998         Original published format: US 218614
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018712
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.05.2000
ClassificationIPC:G07F7/10, G06K19/10
[2000/28]
CPC:
G07F7/08 (EP,US); G06Q20/347 (EP,US); G07F7/125 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/13]
Former [2000/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Sicherheit einer Transaktionskarte, die eingebettete Bilddaten verwendet[2000/28]
English:Method and apparatus for transaction card security utilizing embedded image data[2000/28]
French:Procédé et appareil pour la sécurité d'une carte de transaction avec insertion de données d'image[2000/28]
Examination procedure04.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
19.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/29]
30.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH03185585  ;
 [Y]EP0469864  (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 10 - line 18 *;
 [YA]EP0599558  (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [Y] 3 * abstract * [A] 1,4,6-8;
 [Y]WO9419770  (CANADA MAJESTY IN RIGHT OF [CA]) [Y] 10 * page 14, line 32 - page 15, line 3 *;
 [XY]EP0851397  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * page 4, line 36 - line 56; figure 1 * [Y] 3,5,10
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911113), vol. 15, no. 446, Database accession no. (P - 1274), & JP03185585 A 19910813 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
by applicantUS5436970
 US5466918
 US5636292
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.