EP1016526 - Continuous ink jet print head having power-adjustable segmented heaters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anagnostopoulos, Constantine N., Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Chwalek, James Michael, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Hawkins, Gilbert Allan, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Lewandowsky, Klaus, et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99204206.9 | 08.12.1999 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | US19980221256 | 28.12.1998 Original published format: US 221256 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016526 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016526 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/07, B41J2/105, B41J2/075, B41J2/02, B41J2/14 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
B41J2/03 (EP,US);
B41J2002/032 (EP,US);
B41J2202/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/12] |
Former [2000/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kontinuierlich arbeitender Tintenstrahldruckkopf mit leistungsregulierbaren segmentierten Heizelementen | [2000/27] | English: | Continuous ink jet print head having power-adjustable segmented heaters | [2000/27] | French: | Tête d'impression à jet d'encre continu avec éléments chauffants segmentés réglables en puissance | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3878519 (EATON JAMES H) [A] 1-6 * column 6, line 6 - line 45; figures 3-6 *; | [A]JPS5973964 ; | [A]JPH0664161 ; | [A]US5521621 (ENDO ICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 23, line 44 - line 53; figure 25 *; | [A]US4658269 (REZANKA IVAN [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0856403 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840822), vol. 008, no. 182, Database accession no. (M - 319), & JP59073964 A 19840426 (FUJI XEROX KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940610), vol. 018, no. 304, Database accession no. (M - 1619), & JP06064161 A 19940308 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |