EP1016545 - Ink-jet recording material containing poly(ethylene glycol) and poly(vinyl alcohol) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shaw-Klein, Lori J., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Kapusniak, Richard J., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2000/27] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited, Patents, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 99204246.5 | 13.12.1999 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | US19980224531 | 31.12.1998 Original published format: US 224531 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016545 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016545 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M5/502 (EP,US);
B41M5/506 (EP,US);
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/5236 (EP,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/12] |
Former [2000/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsmaterial, das Polyäthylenglykol und Polyvinylalkohol enthält | [2000/27] | English: | Ink-jet recording material containing poly(ethylene glycol) and poly(vinyl alcohol) | [2000/27] | French: | Matériau pour l'enregistrement par jet d'encre contenant du glycol de polyéthylène et de l'alcool polyvinylique | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 26.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5352503 (DRAKE MARK C [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 9 * * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 31 * * examples 2-7; claims 1-21; table 1 *; | [A]US4686118 (ARAI RYUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 26 * * column 4, line 31 - line 45 * * claims 1,5,11,13 *; | [AD]US5521002 (SNEED MICHAEL C [US]) [AD] 1-10 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 24 * * column 5, line 11 - line 29 * * column 6, line 41 - column 7, line 21 * * examples 1-3; claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0199874 (MEAD CORP [US]) [AD] 1-10 * page 4, line 24 - page 6, line 26 * * example 1; claims 1-3,6,7,9,13 *; | [A]EP0634284 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 1 - line 19 * * page 4, line 40 - page 5, line 14 * * claims 1,2,6 * |