EP1014188 - Photographic material comprising a pyrazolotriazole dye-forming photographic coupler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tang, Ping-Wah, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Cowan, Stanley Wray, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2000/26] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited, Patents, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 99204254.9 | 10.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | US19980219473 | 23.12.1998 Original published format: US 219473 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1014188 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/38, C07D487/04, // (C07D487/04, 249:00, 231:00) | [2000/26] | CPC: |
G03C7/3835 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/11] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Photographische Materialien mit farbstoffbildendem photographischem Kuppler vom Pyrazolotriazol-Typ | [2000/26] | English: | Photographic material comprising a pyrazolotriazole dye-forming photographic coupler | [2000/26] | French: | Matériau photographique contenant un coupleur du type pyrazolotriazole formant un colorant | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 11.05.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0200354 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9 * claim 13 *; | [DX]US5578437 (ASAMI MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [DX] 1-6,8,9 * compound M-14 *;; claim - *; | [A]US5698386 (TANG PING WAH [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |