EP1016342 - Feeding fence [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DE BOER STALINRICHTINGEN B.V. No. 17, Jupiterweg NL-8938 AD Leeuwarden / NL | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oevering, Sake Foarwei 134 9298 JR Kollumerzwaag / NL | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M. Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M. Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2000/27] | Grootscholten, Johannes Antonius Maria Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99204299.4 | 24.12.1999 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | NL19981010912 | 29.12.1998 Original published format: NL 1010912 | [2000/27] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1016342 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1016342 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/06 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
A01K1/0606 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, NL [2001/32] |
Former [2000/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fressgitter | [2000/27] | English: | Feeding fence | [2000/27] | French: | Cornadis | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 03.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/52] | 07.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9951085 (WEELINK BEHEER B V [NL], et al) [PX] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]GB819671 (JAMES EDWARD BIBBY) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 87 - page 4, line 23; figure 1 *; | [X]NL8400199 (SPINDER B V) [X] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]NL8503066 (BROUWERS BV L S) |