EP1013816 - Dry-cleaning kit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2001 [2001/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Little Island Patents, Ltd Mayfield County Cork / IE | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McNamee, Patrick 7 Kiltegan Lawn Rochestown, County Cork / IE | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Duffy, Assumpta Dympna, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Duffy, Assumpta Dympna, et al F. R. Kelly & Co., 27 Clyde Road, Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 99204450.3 | 21.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | IE19980001084 | 21.12.1998 Original published format: IE 981084 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1013816 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D06L1/00, D06L1/02, D06L1/04, C11D17/04 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
C11D17/047 (EP);
D06L1/02 (EP);
D06L1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/11] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Pflegesatz zur chemischen Reinigung | [2000/26] | English: | Dry-cleaning kit | [2000/26] | French: | Kit de nettoyage à sec | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/40] | 02.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/40] | 31.12.2099 | Examination requested [2001/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.01.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.01.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9700738 (RECKITT & COLMAN INC) [X] 1,3-10 * page 10, line 4 - page 11, line 3; claims 19-23; table 1 *; | [DXA]US5238587 (SMITH JAMES A ET AL) [DX] 1,3-6,8-10 * the whole document * [A] 2,7; | [A]WO9700939 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1-10 * examples I-III,V * |