EP1016468 - Method and system for generating and finishing documents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SE | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neopost Industrie B.V. De Tijen 3 9201 BX Drachten / NL | [2004/14] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Neopost B.V. De Tijen 3 9201 BX Drachten / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Meer, Hendrik Theodorus Martinus de Boerstraat 3 9203 RC Drachten / NL | 02 /
Edens, Bertus Karel Flevo 184 9204 JT Drachten / NL | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2000/27] | Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe, et al Vereenigde, Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99204610.2 | 30.12.1999 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | NL19981010936 | 31.12.1998 Original published format: NL 1010936 | [2000/27] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016468 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016468 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B07C1/00, G06F17/21 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
B07C1/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Generieren und Fertigstellen von Dokumenten | [2000/27] | English: | Method and system for generating and finishing documents | [2000/27] | French: | Système et procédé pour générer et achever la préparation des documents | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 29.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.03.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2005 | BE | 02.03.2005 | CH | 02.03.2005 | FI | 02.03.2005 | IT | 02.03.2005 | LI | 02.03.2005 | NL | 02.03.2005 | DK | 02.06.2005 | GR | 02.06.2005 | SE | 02.06.2005 | ES | 13.06.2005 | PT | 17.08.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 02.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0376467 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 4-6,15,26 * abstract *; | [X]NL8901557 (HADEWE BV) [X] 1-3,7,8,20-22,31 * page 2, line 10 - line 37 * * page 3, line 6 - line 27 * * page 5, line 8 - line 18 *; | [XD]US5283752 (GOMBAULT JACOBUS F [NL], et al); | [A]EP0628357 (HADEWE BV [NL]) [A] 11-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 5 - column 7, line 2 *; | [A]EP0678346 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1,22,24,31 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 16 * * column 2, line 11 - line 29 *; | [XD]EP0719597 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [XD] 1,7,10,13,14,22-24,31 * abstract * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 35 *; | [A]US5726897 (TAMMI CHRISTIAN E [US], et al) [A] 1,22,31* abstract *; | [A]EP0851365 (HADEWE BV [NL]) [A] 1,22,31 * abstract * |