EP0950835 - Torque transmitting coupling arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Demag Cranes & Components GmbH Ruhrstrasse 28 58300 Wetter / DE | [2002/33] |
Former [1999/42] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gievers, Winfried, Dipl.-Ing. Hohes Stück 35 58300 Wetter / DE | 02 /
Woyk, Rainer Millöckerweg 8 58313 Herdecke / DE | 03 /
Glogowsky, Jens, Dipl.-Ing. Küssnachtstrasse 20 44143 Dortmund / DE | 04 /
Schmidt, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Grotenkamp 19 44227 Dortmund / DE | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | Moser, Jörg Michael Moser & Götze Patentanwälte Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Moser, Jörg Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Rosastrasse 6 A 45130 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1999/42] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 99250111.4 | 09.04.1999 | [1999/42] | Priority number, date | DE1998117931 | 17.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19817931 | DE1998125442 | 29.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19825442 | [1999/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0950835 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0950835 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0950835 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/02 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
F16H57/025 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2186 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/25] |
Former [1999/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Drehmomentstütze | [1999/42] | English: | Torque transmitting coupling arrangement | [1999/42] | French: | Elément de réaction anti-couple | [1999/42] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 27.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06207699 ; | [A]DE8606067U (KUPPLUNGSTECHNIK GMBH) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE4021054 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5152538 (MIMS STEVE A [US]) [A] 1,2,4,6,7 * column 4, line 52 - line 63 * * column 5, line 15 - line 31 * * column 5, line 56 - line 62 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5156069 (BITSCH HARALD [DE], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * column 3, line 65 ** figure 1 *; | [PA]EP0847127 (SAIA BURGESS ELECTRONICS AG [CH]) [PA] 1 * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 11 * * figures 2,3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941031), vol. 018, no. 569, Database accession no. (M - 1695), & JP06207699 A 19940726 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * * figures 1-9 * |