blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969685

EP0969685 - A method of subscriber data control in a mobile communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/01]A method of subscriber data control data in a mobile communication network
[2000/22]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shimbori, Takateru
NEC Communication Syst. Ltd., 4-28, Mita 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Wenzel & Kalkoff
Patentanwälte
Meiendorfer Strasse 89
22145 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff
Grubesallee 26
22143 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date99250217.902.07.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1999012317128.04.1999         Original published format: JP 12317199
JP1999005619403.03.1999         Original published format: JP 5619499
JP1998018777602.07.1998         Original published format: JP 18777698
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969685
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969685
Date:20.12.2000
[2000/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2000
ClassificationIPC:H04Q7/38
[2000/01]
CPC:
H04W60/00 (EP,US); H04W60/04 (EP,US); H04W8/06 (EP,US);
H04W60/06 (EP,US); H04W8/20 (EP,US); H04W92/24 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/36]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Teilnehmerdatenkontrolle in einem Mobilkommunikationsnetzwerk[2000/01]
English:A method of subscriber data control in a mobile communication network[2000/22]
French:Méthode de contrôle de données d'abonnés dans un réseau de communication mobile[2000/01]
Former [2000/01]A method of subscriber data control data in a mobile communication network
Examination procedure01.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/14]
10.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/18]
25.03.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.06.2008
25.03.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
03.06.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)EP05090315.2  / EP1641307
EP06090118.8  / EP1715713
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9744945  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 6, line 14 - page 13, line 25 * * figure 4 * [A] 2-10;
 [A]EP0260763  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * column W *;
 [A]WO9410810  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 33 *;
 [PX]WO9847305  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al) [PX] 1 * page 5, line 22 - page 12, line 14 *
 [A]  - MOULY M ET AL, "THE GSM SYSTEM", FR,LASSAY-LES-CHATEAUX, EUROPE MEDIA, (1993), pages 466 - 477, XP002047768 [A] 1-10 * column W *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.