blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976646

EP0976646 - Device and method to connect a window sheet to a window regulator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.09.2004  [2004/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG
Ketschendorfer Strasse 38-50
96450 Coburg / DE
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Saunus, Christian, Dipl.-Ing.
Krumme Strasse 12
08223 Grünbach / DE
02 / Sträng, Jörgen
Mädbäcksvägen 6C
S-42677 Västra Frölunda / SE
 [2003/21]
Former [2000/05]01 / Saunus, Christian, Dipl.-Ing.
Krumme Strasse 12
08223 Grünbach / DE
02 / Sträng, Jörgen
Mädbäcksvagen 6C
S-42677 Vastra Frölunda / SE
Representative(s)Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al
Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al
Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Xantener Strasse 10
10707 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date99250244.322.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateDE199813607730.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19836077
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976646
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976646
Date:04.10.2001
[2001/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976646
Date:24.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2001
ClassificationIPC:B62D65/00, B60J1/17
[2000/05]
CPC:
B62D65/00 (EP,US); Y10T29/49764 (EP,US); Y10T29/49829 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4984 (EP,US); Y10T29/53978 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2002/26]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verbinden einer Fensterscheibe mit einem Fensterheber[2000/05]
English:Device and method to connect a window sheet to a window regulator[2000/05]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour fixer un panneau de fenêtre avec un lève-vitre[2000/05]
Examination procedure07.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/45]
05.06.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.07.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT
04.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2003Fee for grant paid
18.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.05.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Fee paid on   05.10.2001
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE24.12.2003
[2004/16]
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH06227460  ;
 [A]JPH0592761  ;
 [A]JPH09207845
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941117), vol. 018, no. 605, Database accession no. (M - 1706), & JP06227460 A 19940816 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,15 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930810), vol. 017, no. 430, Database accession no. (M - 1460), & JP05092761 A 19930416 (DAIFUKU CO LTD) [A] 1,15 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09207845 A 19970812 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,15 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.