EP0930805 - Radiant electric heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | Opposition rejected | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stylewell Limited 16 Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2DX / GB | [2010/09] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states Ceramaspeed Limited Hadzor Hall Hadzor Droitwich, Worcestershire WR9 7DJ / GB | ||
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states Ceramaspeed Limited Hadzor Hall Hadzor Droitwich, Worcestershire WR9 7DJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Higgins, George Anthony 5 Broadwaters Drive, Hagley Stourbridge, West Midlands DY9 0JU / GB | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcestershire WR3 7RY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcestershire WR3 7RY / GB | ||
Former [2000/15] | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates, The Old Yard, Lower Town Claines, Worcester WR3 7RY / GB | ||
Former [1999/29] | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Haven Plough Road Tibberton Droitwich Worcestershire WR9 7NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99300055.3 | 05.01.1999 | [1999/29] | Priority number, date | GB19980000828 | 16.01.1998 Original published format: GB 9800828 | [1999/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0930805 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0930805 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0930805 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/74, H05B1/02 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
H05B1/0266 (EP,US);
H05B3/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2006/25] |
Former [2000/46] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | ||
Former [1999/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrischer Strahlungsheizkörper | [1999/29] | English: | Radiant electric heater | [1999/29] | French: | Elément de chauffage électrique rayonnant | [1999/29] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 18.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.2007
28.03.2007
ADMISSIBLE E.G.O. Elektro-Gerätebau GmbH Rote-Tor-Strasse 14 75038 Oberderdingen / DE Opponent's representative Renger, Florian Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.2007
28.03.2007
ADMISSIBLE E.G.O. Elektro-Gerätebau GmbH Rote-Tor-Strasse 14 75038 Oberderdingen / DE Opponent's representative Renger, Florian Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner, Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | 27.04.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.09.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.12.2008 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 14.11.2012 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2013/02] | Appeal following opposition | 22.01.2009 | Appeal received No. T0287/09 | 07.04.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.11.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2006 | BE | 21.06.2006 | CH | 21.06.2006 | FR | 21.06.2006 | IT | 21.06.2006 | LI | 21.06.2006 | NL | 21.06.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | SE | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/22] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
FR | 09.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 21.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3172996 (SAND ROBERT E, et al) [A] 1 * figures 3-6; claim 6 *; | [A]DE1239034 (ERNST DREEFS GES MIT BESCHRAEN) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8603929 (MICROPORE INTERNATIONAL LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0233375 (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE], et al); | [X]DE3908242 (BUDERUS KUECHENTECHNIK [DE], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * |