EP0932086 - Developing apparatus and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komakine, Hiroshi 1-30-201, Kitamidorigaoka 3-chome Toyonaka City 560-0001 / JP | 02 /
Takeuchi, Keizou 3-21-1-404, Kuzuha-misaki Hirakata City 573-1112 / JP | 03 /
Hayshi, Kazumasa 6-5, Kanokodai-kitamachi 5-chome, Kita-ku Kobe City 651-1513 / JP | 04 /
Tani, Shigemitsu 1-1-75, Deguchi Hirakata City 573-0065 / JP | 05 /
Kitano, Takumi 1198-1-502, Nishiki 1-chome Utsunomiya City 321-0967 / JP | 06 /
Suzuki, Hiroyuki 15-29, Honmachi 4-chome, Oji-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara Pref. 636-0012 / JP | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99300412.6 | 20.01.1999 | [1999/30] | Priority number, date | JP19980025073 | 21.01.1998 Original published format: JP 2507398 | [1999/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0932086 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0932086 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
G03G15/0812 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0866 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/29] |
Former [1999/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Entwicklungsgerät und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1999/30] | English: | Developing apparatus and method for manufacturing the same | [1999/30] | French: | Appareil de développement et sa méthode de fabrication | [1999/30] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/14] | 12.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH0486860 ; | [Y]JPH06186838 ; | [Y]JPH07110622 ; | [X]JPH02221977 ; | [Y]US5185632 (YOSHIDA MINORU [JP], et al) [Y] 12,14,18,23-27 * column 4, line 1 - line 8; figure 2 * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 10 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920708), vol. 016, no. 309, Database accession no. (P - 1382), & JP04086860 A 19920319 (TOSHIBA CORP;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1-4,6-8,15-18,21,22,28 * abstract * [Y] 5,9-14,18,23-27 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941007), vol. 018, no. 532, Database accession no. (P - 1810), & JP06186838 A 19940708 (CANON INC) [Y] 5,9 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, & JP07110622 A 19950425 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 10,11,13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901120), vol. 014, no. 529, Database accession no. (P - 1133), & JP02221977 A 19900904 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 19,20,30 * abstract * |