EP0979927 - Tunnel lining segment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OBAYASHI CORPORATION 4-33, Kitahamahigashi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | For all designated states ISHIKAWAJIMA CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS CO., LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states OBAYASHI CORPORATION 4-33, Kitahamahigashi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | ||
For all designated states ISHIKAWAJIMA CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS CO., LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tauchi, Eiji, c/o OBAYASHI CORPORATION Sinagawa Intercity Tower B, 15-2, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nakano, Akihiko, c/o OBAYASHI CORPORATION Sinagawa Intercity Tower B, 15-2, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Matsubara, Kenta, c/o OBAYASHI CORPORATION Sinagawa Intercity Tower B, 15-2, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Someya, Hiroki, c/o OBAYASHI CORPORATION ISHIKAWAJIMA CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS CO.,LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Okayama, Susumu, c/o OBAYASHI CORPORATION ISHIKAWAJIMA CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS CO.,LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/31] |
Former [2000/07] | 01 /
Tauchi, Eiji, c/o OBAYASHI CORPORATION Sinagawa Intercity Tower B, 15-2, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Nakano, Akihiko, c/o OBAYASHI CORPORATION Sinagawa Intercity Tower B, 15-2, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Matsubara, Kenta, c/o OBAYASHI CORPORATION Sinagawa Intercity Tower B, 15-2, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Someya, Hiroki c/o ISHIKAWAJIMA CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS CO.,LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
05 /
Okayama, Susumu c/o ISHIKAWAJIMA CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS CO.,LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99300507.3 | 25.01.1999 | [2000/07] | Priority number, date | JP19980227412 | 11.08.1998 Original published format: JP 22741298 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979927 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E21D11/08 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
E21D11/083 (EP,US);
E21D11/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/43] |
Former [2000/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tunnelausbausegment | [2000/07] | English: | Tunnel lining segment | [2000/07] | French: | Voussoir de revêtement de tunnels | [2000/07] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 22.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/49] | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10176494 ; | [A]JPH10205289 ; | [A]JPH09221994 ; | [A]JPH0230898 ; | [A]JPH10115190 ; | [A]JPH10140988 ; | [A]GB2103684 (COMMERCIAL SHEARING [US]) [A] 1,13-15 * figure - *; | [A]EP0317220 (FAIRCLOUGH CIVIL ENG [GB]); | [A]EP0386368 (CHARCON TUNNELS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]FR2737535 (SOC D TUYAUX BONNA [FR]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10176494 A 19980630 (ISHIKAWAJIMA CONSTR MATERIALS CO LTD;OHBAYASHI CORP) [A] 1,4-16 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10205289 A 19980804 (ISHIKAWAJIMA CONSTR MATERIALS CO LTD;TODA CONSTR CO LTD; KFC LTD) [A] 2,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09221994 A 19970826 (YAMAMOTO MINORU;ISHIKAWAJIMA CONSTR MATERIALS CO LTD; TSUZUKI JUNICHI;) [A] 13-16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900409), vol. 014, no. 177, Database accession no. (M - 0960), & JP02030898 A 19900201 (KUMAGAI GUMI CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10115190 A 19980506 (CHUBU ELECTRIC POWER CO INC;TOKYO EKON KENTETSU KK) [A] 1,13-15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10140988 A 19980526 (SATO KOGYO CO LTD) [A] 1,13 * abstract * |