EP0931745 - Paper sheet discharge apparatus and printing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takagi, Kazuhiko, c/o Brother Kogyo K.K. 15-1, Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | 02 /
Kashima, Hiroyuki, c/o Brother Kogyo K.K. 15-1, Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99300588.3 | 27.01.1999 | [1999/30] | Priority number, date | JP19980013686 | 27.01.1998 Original published format: JP 1368698 | JP19980032471 | 16.02.1998 Original published format: JP 3247198 | [1999/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0931745 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0931745 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0931745 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65H39/10, B65H39/11 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
G03G15/6538 (EP,US);
B65H31/22 (EP,US);
B65H39/10 (EP,US);
B65H39/11 (EP,US);
B65H2402/10 (EP,US);
B65H2402/60 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/30, B65H2220/01 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/30] | B65H39/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/47] |
Former [1999/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bogenausgabevorrichtung und Druckvorrichtung | [1999/30] | English: | Paper sheet discharge apparatus and printing apparatus | [1999/30] | French: | Dispositif de déchargement de feuilles et dispositif d'impression | [1999/30] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 19.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 08.10.2003 | LI | 08.10.2003 | [2004/33] | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JPH10152261 ; | [XP]JPH1072162 ; | [X]DE2939941 (CANON KK) [X] 1,7* page 12, line 1 - page 13, line 11; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US4520263 (KITAMURA TAKASHI [JP]) [Y] 2,3,8,9 * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 33; figures 1B,2 *; | [XY]EP0798255 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,7 * column 9, line 45 - column 10, line 31; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,3,8,9 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10152261 A 19980609 (CASIO ELECTRON MFG CO LTD) [XP] 1,7 * abstract * | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 8, & JP10072162 A 19980317 (SHARP CORP) [XP] 1,7 * abstract * |