blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0934958

EP0934958 - Styrene resin and resin composition comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.04.2004  [2004/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC.
2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC.
2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sugimoto, Ryuichi
3-4-2-232 Toriishi
Takaishi-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Shiba, Kazu
3-5-23 Shioya
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP
03 / Iwamoto, Mune
3-6-25 Kamo Takaishi-shi
Osaka / JP
[1999/32]
Representative(s)Harvey, David Gareth, et al
Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]Harvey, David Gareth, et al
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date99300926.509.02.1999
[1999/32]
Priority number, dateJP1998002752409.02.1998         Original published format: JP 2752498
JP1998002752509.02.1998         Original published format: JP 2752598
JP1998029213314.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29213398
[1999/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0934958
Date:11.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0934958
Date:23.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.1999
ClassificationIPC:C08F279/04, C08F279/02, C08L69/00
[1999/32]
CPC:
C08L51/04 (EP,US); C08L25/06 (KR); C08F279/02 (EP,US);
C08F279/04 (EP,US); C08L69/00 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C08L51/04, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C08L69/00, C08L25/00 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/16]
Former [1999/32]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Styrolharz und Harzzusammensetzung, die solche enthält[1999/32]
English:Styrene resin and resin composition comprising the same[1999/32]
French:Resin de styrène et composition de résines contenant une telle[1999/32]
Examination procedure22.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/32]
09.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2003Fee for grant paid
04.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3448175  (DOAK KENNETH W, et al) [A] 1-8 * examples 1,2; tables A,B *;
 [A]EP0810242  (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1-9 * examples 1,2; table 8.2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.