EP0938007 - LD/PD module and LED/PD module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakanishi, Hiromi Osaka Works of Sumitomo Elec. Ind. Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome, Konohana-ku, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Kuhara, Yoshiki Osaka Works of Sumitomo Elec. Ind. Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome, Konohana-ku, Osaka / JP | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301020.6 | 12.02.1999 | [1999/34] | Priority number, date | JP19980058806 | 23.02.1998 Original published format: JP 5880698 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0938007 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0938007 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938007 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
G02B6/4246 (EP,US);
G02B6/4204 (EP,US);
G02B6/4214 (EP,US);
G02B6/4292 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/31] |
Former [1999/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | LD/PD Modul und LED/PD Modul | [1999/34] | English: | LD/PD module and LED/PD module | [1999/34] | French: | Module comprenant une diode laser et une photodiode et module comprenant une diode électroluminescente et une photodiode | [1999/34] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 20.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.05.2004 | NL | 06.05.2004 | SE | 06.08.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/13] | NL | 06.05.2004 | |
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 06.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4611884 (ROBERTS HAROLD [US]) [A] 1-5,17-21 * abstract *; | [A]WO9534836 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,17* abstract *; | [A]US5719978 (KAKII TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,17 * abstract * * column 15, line 17 - line 24 *; | [A] - UCHIDA T ET AL, "OPTICAL SURFACE MOUNT TECHNOLOGY", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRONICS,JP,INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, (1997), vol. E80-C, no. 1, ISSN 0916-8524, pages 81 - 87, XP000740608 [A] 1,17 * the whole document * | [A] - UCHIDA N ET AL, "LOW-COST HYBRID WDM MODULE CONSISTING OF A SPOT-SIZE CONVERTER INTEGRATED LASER DIODE AND A WAVEGUIDE PHOTODIODE ON A PLC PLATFORMFOR ACCESS NETWORK SYSTEMS", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRONICS,JP,INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, (1997), vol. E80-C, no. 1, ISSN 0916-8524, pages 88 - 97, XP000740609 [A] 1,17 * the whole document * |