EP0939468 - Drive circuit for light emitting element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mogi, Takayuki c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nishimura, Takashi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301474.5 | 26.02.1999 | [1999/35] | Priority number, date | JP19980047670 | 27.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4767098 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0939468 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0939468 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0939468 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/068, H01S5/042 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
H01S5/042 (EP,US);
H01S5/06808 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/05] | H01S3/096, H01S5/068, H01S5/042 | ||
Former IPC [1999/35] | H01S3/096 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/43] |
Former [1999/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Treiberschaltung für ein lichtemittierendes Element | [1999/35] | English: | Drive circuit for light emitting element | [1999/35] | French: | Circuit de commande d'un élément émetteur de lumière | [1999/35] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 06.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5123023 (SANTARELLI BRYAN A [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract ** figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0756362 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figure 2 * |