EP0999185 - Spindle-shaped goethite particles, spindle-shaped hematite particles and magnetic spindle-shaped metal particles containing iron as main component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toda Kogyo Corporation 1-4, Meijishinkai Otake-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [2009/16] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Toda Kogyo Corporation 1-2, Funairi-minami 4-chome, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | ||
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states TODA KOGYO CORP. 7-1 Yokogawa-Shinmachi Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okinaka, Kenji 56-4-B202, Kaisaku, Tsumasaki Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Maekawa, Masaaki 2-9-1-103, Akasaki Onoda-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. Gray's Inn 14 South Square London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301524.7 | 02.03.1999 | [2000/19] | Priority number, date | JP19980315080 | 05.11.1998 Original published format: JP 31508098 | JP19980344410 | 03.12.1998 Original published format: JP 34441098 | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0999185 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C01G49/06, G11B5/706, B22F9/22 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01G49/00 (KR);
G11B5/70621 (EP,US);
C01G49/06 (EP,US);
C01P2002/52 (EP,US);
C01P2002/60 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2004/04 (EP,US);
C01P2004/10 (EP,US);
C01P2004/54 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2001/03] |
Former [2000/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spindelförmige Goethit-Teilchen, spindelförmige Hämatit- Teilchen und spindelförmige magnetische Eisenoxid-Teilchen die Eisen als Hauptkomponente enthalten | [2000/19] | English: | Spindle-shaped goethite particles, spindle-shaped hematite particles and magnetic spindle-shaped metal particles containing iron as main component | [2000/19] | French: | Particules de goethite sous forme d'une broche, particules d'hématite sous forme d'une broche et particules magnétiques d'oxyde de fer sous forme d'une broche contenant du fer comme composant principal | [2000/19] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 27.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01212232 ; | [PA]JPH1111951 ; | [DE]JPH11130439 ; | [A]US4873010 (TAKEDOI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * examples 41-49 *; | [DA]EP0717397 (TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]) [DA] 1-23 * examples 1,31,89 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 40, Database accession no. 1989-289222, XP002127073 & JPH01212232 A 19890825 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11011951 A 19990119 (TODA KOGYO CORP) [PA] 1 * abstract * | [DE] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 30, Database accession no. 1999-352582, XP002127074 & JPH11130439 A 19990518 (TODA KOGYO KK) [DE] 1 * abstract * |