Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] |
05.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
03.05.2001 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
05.06.2000 | Change - extension states | |
07.04.2000 | Definitive list of designations | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] |
23.12.1999 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] |
30.07.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.09.1999 [1999/37] |