EP0940680 - Gas sensors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E2V Technologies (UK) Limited 106 Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QU / GB | [2004/43] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states EEV LIMITED Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doncaster, Alan Mason 1 Steeple Close, Heybridge Maldon, Essex CM9 4YL / GB | 02 /
Brown, Terence David 36 Cramphorn Walk Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2RD / GB | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Loveless, Ian Mark, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Loveless, Ian Mark, et al Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [1999/36] | Cockayne, Gillian GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301630.2 | 04.03.1999 | [1999/36] | Priority number, date | GB19980004590 | 04.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9804590 | [1999/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0940680 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0940680 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0940680 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00, G01N27/16 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
G01N33/0014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/17] |
Former [2002/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, LI | ||
Former [1999/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gassensoren | [1999/36] | English: | Gas sensors | [1999/36] | French: | Détecteurs de gaz | [1999/36] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 25.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2004 | Observations by third parties | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Request for further processing for: | 26.08.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 25.08.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.09.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   12.02.2002 | 16.01.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   12.02.2002 | 16.01.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   12.02.2002 | 16.01.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   12.02.2002 | 16.01.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   12.02.2002 | 16.01.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   12.02.2002 | 16.01.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   12.02.2002 | 16.01.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   12.02.2002 | 16.01.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   12.02.2002 | 16.01.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   12.02.2002 | 16.01.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   12.02.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2006 | BE | 31.05.2006 | CH | 31.05.2006 | CY | 31.05.2006 | FI | 31.05.2006 | LI | 31.05.2006 | NL | 31.05.2006 | DK | 31.08.2006 | SE | 31.08.2006 | GR | 01.09.2006 | ES | 11.09.2006 | PT | 31.10.2006 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 31.08.2006 | |
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 31.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4242302 (ASAKURA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 8,9* column 1, line 30 - column 3, line 20 *; | [XY]GB2088559 (COAL INDUSTRY PATENTS LTD) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,12,14 * the whole document * [Y] 7-11,13,15,16; | [Y]US4352099 (CHRISTEN PETER, et al) [Y] 10,15 * column 2, line 1 - column 7, line 12 *; | [Y]WO8911653 (WESSEX INSTR LTD [GB]) [Y] 13,16 * page 1, line 5 - page 8, line 36 *; | [Y]EP0667519 (CITY TECH [GB]) [Y] 7 * column 2, line 18 - line 22 *; | [Y]WO9709613 (MINNITECH SENSORS L L C [US]) [Y] 8,9,11 * page 12, line 1 - page 21, line 20 * * page 31, line 7 - line 16 * | other | US4633704 |