blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0961260

EP0961260 - Calibration method and apparatus for display devices. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/48]Input/ouput characteristic measurement method and apparatus for display device
[2012/18]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.08.2013
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.10.2013  [2013/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2012/43]
Former [1999/48]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Murashita, Kimitaka, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / Suzuki, Shoji, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / Mori, Masahiro, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2012/43]
Former [1999/48]01 / Murashita, Kimitaka, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / Suzuki, Shoji, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / Mori, Masahiro, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Representative(s)Keltsch, Ulrike, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/21]Holz, Ulrike, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Former [2012/43]Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London
WC1V 7JH / GB
Former [1999/48]Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99301638.504.03.1999
[1999/48]
Priority number, dateJP1998014578727.05.1998         Original published format: JP 14578798
[1999/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0961260
Date:01.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0961260
Date:01.03.2000
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0961260
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:G09G5/02, G09G1/16
[1999/48]
CPC:
G09G5/003 (EP,US); G09G1/165 (EP,US); G09G5/02 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0276 (EP,US); G09G2320/043 (EP,US); G09G2320/0606 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0673 (EP,US); G09G2320/0693 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/45]
Former [1999/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kalibrierverfahren und Vorrichtung für Anzeigevorrichtungen.[2012/18]
English:Calibration method and apparatus for display devices.[2012/18]
French:Procédé et appareil d'étalonnage pour dispositifs d'affichage.[2012/18]
Former [1999/48]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erfassung von Eingangs-/Ausgangs-Eigenschaften für eine Anzeigevorrichtung,
Former [1999/48]Input/ouput characteristic measurement method and apparatus for display device
Former [1999/48]Procédé et appareil de mesure des caractéristiques d'entrée-sortie pour un dispositif d' affichage
Examination procedure26.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
18.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2012
13.03.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
16.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2012Fee for grant paid
10.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.07.2001
Opposition(s)25.07.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
30.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
29.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
06.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5638117  (ENGELDRUM PETER [US], et al) [X] 1-12,15-17,20,34,35 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 56 * * figures 3,4 * [A] 13,18,19,21-23,25,27,31,32;
 [XA]US5298993  (EDGAR ALBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,9,11,12,15-17,20,34,35 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 24 * * figures 2-4 * [A] 2,7,10,13,18,21-23,25,27,31,32;
 [XA]US5739809  (MCLAUGHLIN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 22,25,27,31 * column A * * column 14, line 1 - column 15, line 11 * * figures 1,2,10 * [A] 23,32;
 [A]EP0785672  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 11,16,22,23,25,27,31,32 * page 2, line 14 - line 43 *;
 [A]EP0665680  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 11,16 * page 2, line 26 - line 31 * * page 5, line 58 - page 6, line 19 * * figures 5-7 *;
 [A]EP0597797  (IBM [US]) [A] 22,23,25,27,31,32 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 15 * * column 7, line 9 - column 8, line 18 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9608811  (ELONEX TECHNOLOGIES INC [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.