12.11.2008 |
Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
24.10.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
04.07.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.01.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.05.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] |
20.03.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.11.2006 |
First examination report |
|
07.11.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.02.2006 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
28.02.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.02.2006 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
21.02.2006 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
04.01.2006 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.10.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.05.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] |
21.05.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.05.2005 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] |
06.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.03.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.11.2004 |
First examination report |
|
02.11.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.09.2001 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
31.05.2001 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
10.05.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
04.04.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.03.2001 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
09.03.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 25.04.2001 [2001/17] |
29.09.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] |
23.06.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] |
30.07.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.09.1999 [1999/37] |