EP0942375 - Adapter device with a local memory and method for processor emulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Limited 1000 Aztec West Almondsbury Bristol BS32 4SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Limited 1000 Aztec West Almondsbury, Bristol BS32 4SQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edwards, David Alan 6 Pro Cathedral Lane Clifton, Bristol BS8 1LB / GB | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Slingsby, Philip Roy, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Slingsby, Philip Roy, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301877.9 | 11.03.1999 | [1999/37] | Priority number, date | GB19980005479 | 13.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9805479 | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0942375 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0942375 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
G06F11/3656 (EP,US);
G06F11/261 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/21] |
Former [1999/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Adaptervorrichtung mit einem lokalen Speicher und Verfahren zur Emulation eines Prozessors | [1999/37] | English: | Adapter device with a local memory and method for processor emulation | [1999/37] | French: | Dispositif d'adaptation avec une mémoire locale et méthode d'émulation d'un processeur | [1999/37] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 14.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.05.2003 | DE | 22.08.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/23] | DE | 22.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0820011 (TEIJIN SEIKI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-28 * abstract *; | [A]US5701488 (MULCHANDANI DEEPAK [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * column 9, line 48 - column 11, line 8; figure 2 *; | [A] - GONZALES D R, "USING THE MOTOROLA DSP ON-CHIP EMULATION CIRCUIT", WESCON TECHNICAL PAPERS, (19921117), vol. 36, pages 680 - 686, XP000350135 [A] 1-28 * page 684, column R, line 32 - page 685, column L, line 34; figure 4 * | [A] - BECKERS F, "UMSTIEG AUF IDT'S R3041 RISC-PROZESSOREN", F & M FEINWERKTECHNIK MIKROTECHNIK MIKROELEKTRONIK, (19960501), vol. 104, no. 5, page 344/345, XP000592216 [A] 1-28 * page 344, column R, line 5 - page 345, column L, line 45; figure 2 * | [A] - LAWDAY G, "FULLY BUFFERED REAL-TIME ICE FOR MULTIPROCESSING", ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, (19910201), vol. 63, no. 770, page 67, 69, 71, XP000208113 [A] 1-28 * page 67, column L, line 39 - page 68, column L, line 25; figure 1 * |