EP0944264 - Apparatus and method of encoding/decoding moving picture and storage medium storing encoded moving picture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Opposition rejected | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LTD. 12, Moriya-Cho 3-Chome, Kanagawa-Ku Yokohama-Shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LTD. 12, Moriya-Cho 3-Chome, Kanagawa-Ku Yokohama-Shi, Kanagawa-Ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugiyama, Kenji 1-4-2-802, Yonegahama-dori Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-Ken / JP | [1999/43] |
Former [1999/38] | 01 /
Sugiyama, Kenji 4-20-10, Negishi-Cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-Ken / JP | Representative(s) | Jennings, Michael John, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Jennings, Michael John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [1999/38] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301991.8 | 16.03.1999 | [1999/38] | Priority number, date | JP19980091050 | 19.03.1998 Original published format: JP 9105098 | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0944264 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0944264 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0944264 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/46, H04N7/36 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
H04N19/59 (EP,US);
H04N19/85 (EP,US);
H04N19/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/38] | H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/08] |
Former [1999/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Kodierung/Dekodierung von Bewegtbildern und Speichermedium zur Speicherung von den kodierten Bewegtbildern | [1999/38] | English: | Apparatus and method of encoding/decoding moving picture and storage medium storing encoded moving picture | [1999/38] | French: | Appareil et procédé de codage/décodage d'images animées et milieu de stockage pour stocker les images animées codées | [1999/38] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.2005
24.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte e.V. (IGR e.V.) Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Kinnstätter, Klaus Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.2005
24.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte e.V. (IGR e.V.) Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Kinnstätter, Klaus Maryniok & Eichstädt Patentanwälte GbR Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.2005
24.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V. Bahnstrasse 62 D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Kinnstätter, Klaus Maryniok & Eichstädt Patentanwälte GbR Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
Former [2006/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.2005
24.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE IGR GmbH & Co. KG. Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Kinnstätter, Klaus Maryniok & Eichstädt Patentanwälte GbR Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
Former [2005/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.2005
24.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte e.V. (IGR e.V.) Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Kinnstätter, Klaus Maryniok & Eichstädt Patentanwälte GbR Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | 20.06.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.10.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.07.2006 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 19.07.2011 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2011/51] | Appeal following opposition | 14.09.2006 | Appeal received No. T1494/06 | 01.12.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.07.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 19.07.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.07.2011 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0596423 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 32 *; | [A]EP0683615 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 1-7 * column 5, line 12 - column 6, line 49 *; | [A]US5539466 (IGARASHI KATSUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 5, line 24 - column 9, line 41 *; | [A]US5666461 (IGARASHI KATSUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 6, line 22 - column 11, line 10 * * column 15, line 4 - column 16, line 49 *; | [PA]EP0881835 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [PA] 1-7* column 12, line 45 - column 24, line 32 * |