EP0943538 - Life raft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/38] | Liferaft | ||
[2000/01] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hayward, Terence 10 Wentworth Drive, Bromborough Wirral Merseyside L63 0JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states Hayward, Terence 10 Wentworth Drive, Bromborough Wirral, Merseyside L63 0JA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99302048.6 | 17.03.1999 | [1999/38] | Priority number, date | GB19980005542 | 17.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9805542 | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0943538 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0943538 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | [2001/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B63C9/04, // B63B7/08 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
B63C9/04 (EP);
B63C2009/042 (EP);
B63C2009/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/43] |
Former [1999/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rettungsinsel | [1999/38] | English: | Life raft | [2000/01] | French: | Radeau de sauvetage | [1999/38] |
Former [1999/38] | Liferaft | Examination procedure | 02.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/20] | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3058127 (GABRIELE HASSOLD) [X] 1,3 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 10 - line 28 * * column 2, line 61 - line 67 *; | [X]DE3015620 (BALLONFAB SEE LUFTAUSR GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US3155992 (SHEWMAKE GLENN A, et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-4 * * column 2, line 48 - line 72 * * column 4, line 10 - line 13 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 4 * * column 5, line 31 - line 33 *; | [X]US1686366 (BOYLE JAMES F) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 78 - line 107 * * page 2, line 24 - line 51 * * page 3, line 70 - line 94 *; | [A]DE2411425 (SCHEIBERT DT SCHLAUCHBOOTFAB) [A] 2,3 * figures 1,3; claims 1,5 * |