|
21.08.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Confirmation of the correction of a decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2008 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
27.06.2008 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2008 |
Correction to published European patent application/patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.05.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2007 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2004 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2000 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2000 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
02.01.2000 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
01.12.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1999 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.1999 |
Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1999 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.1999 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.1999 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.1999 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.03.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
22.03.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.03.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.03.1999 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
22.03.1999 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |