Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3278398B | Global Dossier | 30.04.2002 | B2 | JPH11297397 | 29.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP10304298 | 14.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3266095B | Global Dossier | 18.03.2002 | B2 | JPH11283687 | 15.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8194898 | 27.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0945924 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2003 | B1 | EP0945924 | 02.01.2002 | A3 | EP0945924 | 29.09.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP8194898 | 27.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1230808 | 06.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8194898 | 27.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69910289T | 03.06.2004 | T2 | DE69910289D1 | 18.09.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP8194898 | 27.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6139375 | 31.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8194898 | 27.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0945925 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2008 | B8 | EP0945925 | 14.05.2008 | B1 | EP0945925 | 03.11.1999 | A3 | EP0945925 | 29.09.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP8194898 | 27.03.1998 | JP10304298 | 14.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1230809 | 06.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8194898 | 27.03.1998 | JP10304298 | 14.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69938685D1 | 26.06.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP8194898 | 27.03.1998 | JP10304298 | 14.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6200172 | 13.03.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP8194898 | 27.03.1998 | JP10304298 | 14.04.1998 |